THE COGGES WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 238579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £878 £1.17k £1.04k £1.11k £1.62k
Total expenditure £1.19k £812 £409 £462 £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A