Trustees FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, LONDON

Charity number: 238685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEREMY BRADSHAW Trustee 17 January 2022
REBOOT THE FUTURE
Received: On time
NONESUCH ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Christine Bradshaw Trustee 17 January 2022
None on record
Robin Harragin Trustee 17 January 2022
None on record
Angela Wallace Trustee 15 February 2021
PENSION TRUST FOR CHRISTIAN SCIENCE NURSES
Received: On time
Kathleen Harrison Trustee 15 February 2021
None on record
Mark Tousey Trustee 13 July 2020
None on record
Peter King Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
JOHN LUKE Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record