JOHN BAKER SLADEN

Charity number: 238768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 December 2019 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 February 2018 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required