VILLAGE HALL KINGSTON BAGPUIZE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social , educational and sporting activities for members of the village community of all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 15 January 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen James Smith | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sheila Cruickshank Richards | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Jane Oastler | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Neil Dennis Oastler | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Sharon Cooper | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Shorter | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Kathleen Fletcher | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Victoria Paleit | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Hazel Anne Brennan | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Elizabeth Shewry | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.77k | £23.31k | £6.14k | £14.75k | £22.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.08k | £14.98k | £18.73k | £17.05k | £27.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 November 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6TH AUGUST 1964 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 26TH MARCH 1984
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF KINGSTON BAGPUIZE AND SOUTHMOOR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON BAGPUIZE AND SOUTHMOOR AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sunny Lawn
Faringdon Road
Southmoor
Abingdon
OX13 5BG
- Phone:
- 01865821594
- Email:
- victoriapaleit@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
SouthmoorVillageHall.DraycottRoadSouthmoor
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window