SIR WALTER MOYLE'S ALMSHOUSES, ST GERMANS

Charity number: 238800
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 26 January 2021 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 31 December 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 06 March 2018 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 21 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required