Financial history THE VICKERS DUNFEE MEMORIAL BENEVOLENT FUND - CITY OF LONDON SPECIAL CONSTABULARY

Charity number: 238878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.99k £6.81k £6.92k £8.01k £9.74k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £40 £1.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A