FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, CROYDON, SURREY

Charity number: 238906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £35.27k £37.05k £44.07k £51.00k £33.76k
Total expenditure £42.18k £33.41k £43.43k £38.69k £35.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A