SOUTHGATE PROGRESSIVE SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 239096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachelle Ellenby Trustee 20 June 2013 None on record
Michelle Rabb Trustee 13 June 2018 None on record
STEPHEN LESLEY Trustee 09 August 2011 None on record
David Hockman Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Amanda Lesley Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Norma Jacobs Trustee 13 June 2017 None on record
Anthony Marsh Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Mark Shw Chair 05 February 2020 None on record
CAROLE SHOTTS Trustee 29 June 2016 None on record
BARBARA LEILA MARTIN Trustee 24 June 1997 None on record
Stephanie Marsh Trustee 06 May 2020 None on record
JULIAN SAMPSON Trustee 24 June 2015 None on record