CHARITY OF THE REVEREND MICHAEL SEYMOUR EDGELL

Charity number: 239106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £339 £685 £378 £252 £427
Total expenditure £154 £160 £320 £163 £168
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A