Financial history SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY

Charity number: 239166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.76k £1.81k £1.89k £1.90k £1.96k
Total expenditure £1.75k £1.50k £1.75k £1.80k £1.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A