Trustees UNKNOWN DONOR

Charity number: 239246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy John Stafford Chair 21 September 2016
None on record
Stuart Margetts Trustee 12 October 2021
ELMER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ELMER EXHIBITION FUND
Received: On time
David Muston Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Nicole Lucinda Williams Trustee 26 April 2019
None on record
margaret evans Trustee 15 June 2015
ELMER'S CHARITY
Received: On time