Governing document Little Baddow Almshouses
Charity number: 239382

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 23 JUNE 1971, SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER DATED 27 NOVEMBER 1981, AND SCHEME DATED 7 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 10 APRIL 2007 as amended on 18 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF LITTLE BADDOW AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF LITTLE BADDOW.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.