Financial history WOODROFFE BEQUEST ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)

Charity number: 239417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £60 £63 £67 £70 £57
Total expenditure £60 £63 £67 £70 £57
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A