WHITTINGHAM BEQUEST

Charity number: 239419
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £309 £318 £335 £354 £372
Total expenditure £309 £318 £335 £354 £372