Accounts and annual returns FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST SUTTON COLDFIELD AND READING ROOM

Charity number: 239667
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required