Financial history KINGSTHORPE MANOR AND TOWN CHARITY

Charity number: 239688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £7.36k £9.13k £10.25k £10.99k £11.79k
Total expenditure £11.09k £5.34k £8.85k £24.31k £8.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A