KINGSTHORPE MANOR AND TOWN CHARITY

Charity number: 239688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP LARRATT Trustee 11 May 2017 None on record
SALLY BEARDSWORTH Trustee
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND Received: 2 days late
THE KINGSTHORPE MOORS TRUST Received: On time
KERR HOUSE CHARITY Received: On time
COMMUNITY LAW SERVICE(NORTHAMPTON AND COUNTY) Received: On time
Michael O'Connor Trustee 11 May 2018 None on record
ALAN HAYNES Trustee 11 November 2015 None on record
AILEEN ANNE DUNKLEY Trustee 28 July 2011
THE KINGSTHORPE MOORS TRUST Received: On time
Richard Thomas Askew Chair 19 December 2012
THE KINGSTHORPE MOORS TRUST Received: On time