Accounts and annual returns JOHN WRENN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 239786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 April 2020 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required