Financial history JOHN WRENN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 239786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.79k £1.79k £1.79k £1.76k £1.76k
Total expenditure £1.61k £1.53k £1.53k £1.62k £255
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A