PEASENHALL UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 239911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.01k £1.03k £1.03k £1.07k £1.02k
Total expenditure £609 £528 £528 £800 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A