THE GUILD OF ALL SOULS

Charity number: 240234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 11 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 02 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 07 May 2020 7 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 15 November 2017 On time Download