RIVINGTON PRESBYTERIAN CHAPEL (TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH)

Charity number: 240302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required