ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX HAVERING AND HAROLD HILL BRANCH

Charity number: 240507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £90.57k £70.16k £77.74k £25.89k £36.09k
Total expenditure £87.50k £113.31k £37.69k £23.89k £30.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A