EDITH SPEAR MANN FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE PREACHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for the preaching of the Christian Gospel in the Moreton-in-Marsh area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 02 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev BARBARA BRIDGES | Chair | 31 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
KIM ELIZABETH MCQUAIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER MCQUAIL BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204 | £209 | £213 | £220 | £235 | |
|
Total expenditure | £700 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
U.V.123P.96. WILL OF THE 1ST JULY 1902.
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE PREACHER.
Area of benefit
MORETON IN MARSH
Contact information
- Address:
-
MYRTLE COTTAGE
POST OFFICE LANE
DRAYCOTT
MORETON-IN-MARSH
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL56 9JZ
- Phone:
- 01608651946
- Email:
- kim@mcquail.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window