THE BRECKNOCK WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 240671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required