Financial history THE CARVER TRUST COTTAGES

Charity number: 240706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.66k £8.91k £11.44k £9.49k £8.02k
Total expenditure £8.05k £3.96k £9.26k £21.09k £31.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A