Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, BLACKPOOL

Charity number: 240921
Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 460 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 460 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 825 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 825 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1191 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1191 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required