Financial history CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, BLACKPOOL

Charity number: 240921
Charity reporting is overdue by 1190 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £2.29k £54.85k £1.62k £1.39k £11.26k
Total expenditure £16.63k £44.24k £22.63k £20.34k £26.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0