Financial history THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND

Charity number: 241083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £40.70m £43.00m £46.80m £44.40m £47.80m
Total expenditure £42.40m £45.70m £47.80m £47.20m £49.50m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £450.00k £432.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £31.00m £32.50m £35.10m £35.30m £37.50m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.40m £3.50m £3.50m £3.20m £3.60m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.50m £5.80m £6.30m £5.40m £6.00m
Income - Other £800.00k £1.20m £1.90m £500.00k £700.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £5.00k £155.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £39.60m £42.90m £45.00m £44.30m £46.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.30m £1.60m £1.60m £2.30m £2.20m
Expenditure - Governance £461.00k £328.00k £350.00k £367.00k £594.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.30m £1.60m £1.40m £1.60m £1.90m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.30m £1.60m £1.60m £2.30m £2.20m
Expenditure - Other £1.50m £1.20m £1.20m £600.00k £500.00k