Financial history NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF GEORGE AND OTHERS

Charity number: 241189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £615 £3.43k £1.92k £3.01k £3.13k
Total expenditure £0 £4.29k £1.00k £1.11k £2.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A