JOHN OLDNALL

Charity number: 241201
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £95 £86 £78 £74 £132
Total expenditure £95 £86 £78 £74 £132
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A