GRAPPENHALL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 241211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £6.47k £6.33k £5.40k £4.45k £395
Total expenditure £5.95k £6.31k £4.52k £4.45k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A