Financial history CATHOLIC HOUSING AID SOCIETY (WEST LONDON)

Charity number: 241225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.67k £6.59k £6.71k £7.37k £88.07k
Total expenditure £14.96k £21.52k £22.50k £25.23k £18.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A