Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITY OF DR JONES

Charity number: 241351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window