Accounts and annual returns POORS ALLOTMENT (OTHERWISE THE POOR RAND TRUST)

Charity number: 241356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required