Financial history POORS ALLOTMENT (OTHERWISE THE POOR RAND TRUST)

Charity number: 241356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.02k £0 £1.02k £0 £0
Total expenditure £150 £200 £480 £600 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A