WOKING MOSQUE FUND AND SIR SALAR JUNG MEMORIAL HOUSE

Charity number: 241402
Charity reporting is up to date (86 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 25 November 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 November 2020 86 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 05 February 2020 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 23 September 2019 23 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 23 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 23 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 27 April 2018 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 27 April 2018 239 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 03 November 2016 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 03 November 2016 64 days late Download