TUMBLE WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 241448
Removed charity
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 16TH MAY 1948; CONVEYANCE DATED 28TH JANUARY, 1954; RULES.
Charitable objects
CARRYING OUT, UNDER RULES APPROVED BY THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION SOCIAL WELFARE ACTIVITIES, WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE MINERS' WELFARE ACT, 1952, PURSUANT TO THE FRIENDLY SOCIETIES ACT, 1896 AND THE SPECIAL AUTHORITY OF THE 15TH DECEMBER, 1952.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 26 March 1965 : registered
  • 25 February 1994 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
    No information available
Who the charity helped
    No information available
How the charity helped
    No information available