THE WORTHAM WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 241664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JACQUELINE SUSAN BRADLEY Chair
WORTHAM VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
John Scott Trustee 04 November 2015 None on record
MAUREEN LING Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF WORTHAM CHURCH Received: On time
Jenny Piper Trustee 25 March 2015 None on record
Janice Lloyd Trustee 14 May 2014 None on record
DR Sue Bawden Trustee 01 November 2013 None on record
Jonathan Dickson Trustee 17 November 2014 None on record