THE GRANADA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 241693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download