POOR'S LAND

Charity number: 241834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required