Financial history POOR'S LAND

Charity number: 241954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2017 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020 01/01/2021
Total gross income £700 £700 £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Total expenditure £600 £600 £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A