THE MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 242101
Charity reporting is overdue by 667 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 301 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 301 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 667 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 667 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required