THE TENBURY DISPENSARY

Charity number: 242142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required