PETTIT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support charities registered in the UK operating in the fields of disability, mental health, poverty relief, equality and diversity with a gross annual income of less than £500,000. Grant applications should be submitted by email between October and December for one-off grants of £300-500 which will be made the following February/March.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 July 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Pettit | Trustee | 11 March 1980 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pettit | Trustee |
|
||||||
Paul Pettit | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Julia Warren | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hazel Lipman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.86k | £10.75k | £7.88k | £8.79k | £7.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.50k | £9.25k | £10.15k | £8.80k | £6.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED THE 14TH OCTOBER 1963
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS OR BODIES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Gade Avenue
Watford
Hertfordshire
WD18 7LG
- Phone:
- 01923 225559
- Email:
- pct.applications@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window