Trustees CANYNGES SOCIETY (FRIENDS OF ST MARY REDCLIFFE)

Charity number: 242231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Prescott Chair 11 April 2018
None on record
Helen Louise Walker Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Christopher Michael James Stanley Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Edward Kenneth Clarke Trustee 12 May 2020
None on record
PAMELA REID Trustee 12 May 2020
None on record
Philip Marc Pratt Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
Savita Anne Willmott Trustee 11 April 2018
THE ASSOCIATION FOR SCIENCE AND DISCOVERY CENTRES
Received: 57 days late