SHEEPSTOR WELFARE CHARITY

Charity number: 242246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 February 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 06 February 2020 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 February 2019 09 March 2020 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 06 February 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 06 February 2017 15 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 February 2017 Not Required