SHEEPSTOR WELFARE CHARITY

Charity number: 242246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/02/2017 06/02/2018 06/02/2019 06/02/2020 06/02/2021
Total gross income £176 £186 £193 £200 £180
Total expenditure £182 £250 £172 £23 £44
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A