BRAMPTON TRUST

Charity number: 242326
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 May 2021 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 May 2021 88 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 01 September 2020 209 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 13 December 2016 On time Download