Financial history THE SHELDON TRUST

Charity number: 242328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £238.58k £266.11k £273.08k £267.27k £231.97k
Total expenditure £180.40k £290.69k £277.37k £233.34k £226.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A